Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Cesare Boccanera

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Narni, Italy

Titular Archbishop of Nicosia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jun 1840Born
4 Apr 186322.7Ordained PriestPriest
11 Feb 188948.6AppointedBishop of Narni, Italy
17 Feb 188948.6Ordained BishopBishop of Narni, Italy
Nov 1905³65.3ResignedBishop of Narni, Italy
11 Dec 190565.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nicosia
27 Feb 191574.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Narni, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Cesare Boccanera (VIAF: 89596186)
Archbishop Cesare Boccanera (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Narni

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Ordained BishopSt. Apollinaire, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 51.8 years
  • a bishop for 26.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 402
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1889, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 May 2017