Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre-Adophe Pinsoneault, P.S.S. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Sandwich, Ontario, Canada

Titular Bishop of Birtha


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Nov 1815Born
19 Dec 184025.0Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Priests of Saint Sulpice
29 Feb 185640.2AppointedBishop of London, Ontario, Canada
18 May 185640.4Ordained BishopBishop of London, Ontario, Canada
2 Feb 185943.1AppointedBishop of Sandwich, Ontario, Canada
4 Oct 186650.8ResignedBishop of Sandwich, Ontario, Canada
4 Dec 186853.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Birtha
30 Jan 188367.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Sandwich, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Adophe Pinsoneault (VIAF: 61075095)
Bishop Pierre-Adophe Pinsoneault P.S.S. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Sandwich

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Philippe-de-Laprairie
Ordained PriestIssy-les-Moulineaux, France
Ordained BishopS. Jacques, Montréal, Diocese of Montréal, Québec
Death PlaceMontréal, Diocese of Montréal, Québec

  • a priest for 42.1 years
  • a bishop for 26.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 149, and Page 348
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1856, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Mar 2017