Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph-Jean-Baptiste Hallé

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Northern Ontario (Ontario-Nord)

Titular Bishop of Perrhe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Dec 1874BornNotre-Dame-de-Lévis
19 Sep 189722.8Ordained PriestPriest
18 Apr 191843.4AppointedPrefect of Northern Ontario (Ontario-Nord), Canada
21 Jun 191944.5InstalledPrefect of Northern Ontario (Ontario-Nord), Canada
16 Dec 192046.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Northern Ontario (Ontario-Nord), Canada
16 Dec 192046.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Theveste
18 Dec 192046.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Perrhe
17 Apr 192146.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Perrhe
7 Oct 193964.8DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Northern Ontario (Ontario-Nord), Canada

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Jean-Baptiste Hallé:
Bishop Joseph-Jean-Baptiste Hallé (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Northern Ontario (Ontario-Nord)

  • a priest for 42.1 years
  • a bishop for 18.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1921, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013