Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles-François d’Hallencourt de Dromesnil

Deceased

Bishop of Verdun


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Oct 1674BornNeuville sur Ailette
11 Jul 171035.7SelectedBishop of Autun, France
26 Jan 171136.2ConfirmedBishop of Autun, France
22 Mar 171136.4Ordained BishopBishop of Autun, France
11 Feb 172146.2SelectedBishop of Verdun, France
8 Sep 172146.8ResignedBishop of Autun, France
1 Jun 172247.6ConfirmedBishop of Verdun, France
7 Jan 172348.2InstalledBishop of Verdun, France
16 Mar 175479.3DiedBishop of Verdun, France

MicroData Summary for Charles-François d’Hallencourt de Dromesnil:
Bishop Charles-François d’Hallencourt de Dromesnil (born , died ) Bishop of Verdun

  • a bishop for 42.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 70, and Page 416
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1711, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 30 Jun 2015