Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pedro Raimundo Cardinal de Barrière, C.R.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Autun, France

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Marcellino e Pietro

Note/Previous Titular See: (Pseudocardinal)


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Feb 1348AppointedBishop of Coria, Spain
6 Jun 1350Ordained BishopBishop of Coria, Spain
31 Aug 1360AppointedBishop of León, Spain
19 Nov 1361AppointedBishop of Toul, France
5 Jul 1363AppointedBishop of Mirepoix, France
22 Apr 1377AppointedBishop of Autun, France
18 Dec 1378Elevated to Cardinal
18 Dec 1378ResignedBishop of Autun, France
3 Oct 1379AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Marcellino e Pietro
13 Jun 1383DiedCardinal-Priest of Santi Marcellino e Pietro

MicroData Summary for Pedro Raimundo de Barrière
Pedro Raimundo Cardinal de Barrière C.R.S.A. (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Autun

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRodez, Diocese of Rodez
Ordained BishopMarseille, Diocese of Marseille
Death PlaceAvignon, Diocese of Avignon
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Avignon, Diocese of Avignon

  • a bishop for 33.0 years
  • a cardinal for 4.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 178, and Page 502
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 300, and Page 344
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 73
  • b/c23: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 303, Number 158
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Dec 1378
  • ob/c3: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 80, Number 6,452

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast