Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Ferry Cardinal de Clugny

Deceased

Bishop of Tournai {Doornik}

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Domnica

Cardinal-Priest of San Vitale


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1430¹BornAutun, France
8 Oct 147343.8AppointedBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
2 Jan 147444.0Ordained BishopBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
15 May 148050.4Elevated to Cardinal
Jun 1480²50.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Vitale
Apr 1482²52.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Domnica
7 Oct 148353.8DiedBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ferry de Clugny:
Cardinal Ferry de Clugny (died ) Bishop of Tournai {Doornik}

  • a bishop for 9.8 years
  • a cardinal for 3.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 15 May 1480
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 253
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118, Number 10,529

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013