Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Baptiste Thomas

Deceased

Bishop of Langres, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Sep 1868Born
30 Mar 192556.5AppointedBishop of Langres, France
24 Jun 192556.7Ordained BishopBishop of Langres, France
16 Jan 192960.3DiedBishop of Langres, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste Thomas
Bishop Jean-Baptiste Thomas (born , died ) Bishop of Langres

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMailly

  • a bishop for 3.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1925, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017