Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philippe de Clèves

Deceased

Bishop of Autun, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1467¹Born
24 Jan 150033.0AppointedBishop of Nevers, France
14 Jun 150134.4AppointedAdministrator of Amiens, France
9 Aug 150336.6AppointedBishop of Autun, France
5 Mar 150538.1DiedBishop of Autun, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Philippe de Clèves (VIAF: 171213250)
Bishop Philippe de Clèves (born 1467, died ) Bishop of Autun

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 95, and Page 259
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 106
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 204, and Page 81
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 86
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,500, Number 2*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast