Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Godefroid-Maurice de Conflans

Deceased

Bishop of Le Puy-en-Velay


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1676¹Born
8 Jan 172145.0SelectedBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
16 Jun 172145.4ConfirmedBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
20 Jul 172145.5Ordained BishopBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
14 Mar 172549.2DiedBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Godefroid-Maurice de Conflans:
Bishop Godefroid-Maurice de Conflans (born 1676, died ) Bishop of Le Puy-en-Velay

  • a bishop for 3.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 87
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1721, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015