Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Armand-Pierre de la Croix de Castries

Deceased

Archbishop of Albi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Apr 1664BornMontpellier
1692¹27.7Ordained PriestPriest
29 Jan 171752.7SelectedArchbishop of Tours, France
18 Sep 171955.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Tours, France
29 Oct 171955.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Tours, France
5 Nov 171955.5SelectedArchbishop of Albi, France
23 Sep 172258.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Albi, France
15 Apr 174783.0DiedArchbishop of Albi, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Armand-Pierre de la Croix de Castries:
Archbishop Armand-Pierre de la Croix de Castries (born , died ) Archbishop of Albi

  • a priest for 55.2 years
  • a bishop for 27.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 75, and Page 395
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1719, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015