Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Pierre Paul Joseph de Brunet de Pujols de Castelpers de Panat

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Albi, France

Titular Bishop of Euroea in Epiro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1702¹Born
30 Sep 173937.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Albi, France
30 Sep 173937.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Euroea in Epiro
1 May 174038.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Euroea in Epiro
18 Jul 176664.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Albi, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean Pierre Paul Joseph de Brunet de Pujols de Castelpers de Panat
Bishop Jean Pierre Paul Joseph de Brunet de Pujols de Castelpers de Panat (born 1702, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Albi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRodez

  • a bishop for 26.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 211, and Page 452
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1,740, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast