Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Baptiste de Beaumanoir de Lavardin

Deceased

Bishop of Rennes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1641¹BornLavardin
17 Dec 166726.9Ordained PriestPriest
26 Nov 167635.9SelectedBishop of Rennes, France
8 Nov 167736.8ConfirmedBishop of Rennes, France
20 Feb 167837.1Ordained BishopBishop of Rennes, France
23 May 171170.3DiedBishop of Rennes, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste de Beaumanoir de Lavardin:
Bishop Jean-Baptiste de Beaumanoir de Lavardin (born 1641, died ) Bishop of Rennes

  • a priest for 43.4 years
  • a bishop for 33.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 330
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1678, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 15 Apr 2015