Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Henri de Nesmond

Deceased

Archbishop of Toulouse, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1652Born
15 Oct 169240.7AppointedBishop of Montauban, France
24 May 169341.3Ordained BishopBishop of Montauban, France
15 Aug 170351.6SelectedArchbishop of Albi, France
12 Nov 170351.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Albi, France
16 Nov 171967.8SelectedArchbishop of Toulouse, France
14 Jan 172270.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Toulouse, France
27 May 172775.4DiedArchbishop of Toulouse, France

MicroData Summary for Henri de Nesmond
Archbishop Henri de Nesmond (born 1652, died ) Archbishop of Toulouse

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBordeaux

  • a bishop for 34.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 75, and Page 273
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 378
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1693, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018