Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Louis de La Bourdonnaye

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Pol-de-Léon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Feb 1667BornRennes
5 Jun 169427.2Ordained PriestPriest
1 Nov 170134.6SelectedBishop of Saint-Pol-de-Léon, France
6 Feb 170234.9ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Pol-de-Léon, France
23 Apr 170235.1Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Pol-de-Léon, France
22 Feb 174577.9DiedBishop of Saint-Pol-de-Léon, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Louis de La Bourdonnaye:
Bishop Jean-Louis de La Bourdonnaye (born , died ) Bishop of Saint-Pol-de-Léon

  • a priest for 50.7 years
  • a bishop for 42.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 242
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1702, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 20 May 2015