Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles-Louis-Auguste Le Tonnelier de Breteuil

Deceased

Bishop of Rennes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1687¹BornParis
26 Oct 172336.8SelectedBishop of Rennes, France
11 Jun 172538.4ConfirmedBishop of Rennes, France
15 Jul 172538.5Ordained BishopBishop of Rennes, France
24 Apr 173245.3DiedBishop of Rennes, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Charles-Louis-Auguste Le Tonnelier de Breteuil:
Bishop Charles-Louis-Auguste Le Tonnelier de Breteuil (born 1687, died ) Bishop of Rennes

  • a bishop for 6.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 331
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1725, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015