Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis Frétat de Boissieu

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Brieuc


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Dec 1662BornBoissieu
11 Apr 170542.3SelectedBishop of Saint-Brieuc, France
7 Sep 170542.7ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Brieuc, France
11 Oct 170542.8Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Brieuc, France
30 Oct 172057.8DiedBishop of Saint-Brieuc, France

MicroData Summary for Louis Frétat de Boissieu:
Bishop Louis Frétat de Boissieu (born , died ) Bishop of Saint-Brieuc

  • a bishop for 15.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 126
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1705, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 2 Sep 2015