Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Raimond de Salg

Deceased

Bishop of Agen, France

Titular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}


Events

DateEventTitle
21 Aug 1357AppointedBishop of Elne, France
18 Jun 1361AppointedArchbishop of Embrun, France
10 Jan 1364AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Agen, France
10 Jan 1364AppointedTitular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}
1375¹DiedBishop of Agen, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Raimond de Salg
Patriarch Raimond de Salg (died 1375) Bishop of Agen

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 239, and Page 234
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 77, and Page 93

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 31 Aug 2021

Quantcast