Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Claude de Gelas

Deceased

Bishop of Agen, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1563¹Born
29 Apr 160946.3AppointedBishop of Agen, France
25 Oct 160946.8Ordained BishopBishop of Agen, France
26 Dec 163067.9DiedBishop of Agen, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Claude de Gelas
Bishop Claude de Gelas (born 1563, died ) Bishop of Agen

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLyon

  • a bishop for 21.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 72
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1609, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast