Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raymond de La Marthonie

Deceased

Bishop of Limoges, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1581¹Born
20 Jul 161534.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Limoges, France
20 Jul 161534.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Chalcedon
20 Sep 161534.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Chalcedon
7 Oct 161837.7SucceededBishop of Limoges, France
11 Jan 162746.0DiedBishop of Limoges, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Raymond de La Marthonie (VIAF: 309916596)
Bishop Raymond de La Marthonie (born 1581, died ) Bishop of Limoges

EventPlace
Birth PlacePérigueux

  • a bishop for 11.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 147, and Page 219
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,615, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast