Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guillaume Le Gouverneur

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Malo, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jul 1573Born
30 Aug 161037.1AppointedBishop of Saint-Malo, France
20 Feb 161137.6Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Malo, France
25 Jun 163056.9DiedBishop of Saint-Malo, France

MicroData Summary for Guillaume Le Gouverneur
Bishop Guillaume Le Gouverneur (born , died ) Bishop of Saint-Malo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Malo

  • a bishop for 19.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 227
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1611, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018