Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Charles Miron

Deceased

Archbishop of Lyon, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1563¹Born
20 Jun 158825.4AppointedBishop of Angers, France
21 Apr 159128.3Ordained BishopBishop of Angers, France
May 161653.3ResignedBishop of Angers, France
19 Jan 162259.0AppointedBishop of Angers, France
2 Dec 162663.9AppointedArchbishop of Lyon, France
12 Feb 162764.1InstalledArchbishop of Lyon, France
6 Aug 162865.5DiedArchbishop of Lyon, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Charles Miron (VIAF: 316748786)
Archbishop Charles Miron (born 1563, died ) Archbishop of Lyon

EventPlace
Ordained BishopTours, Archdiocese of Tours

  • a bishop for 37.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 82
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1591, Number 7
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 108

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018