Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paul Hurault de l’Hospital

Deceased

Archbishop of Aix, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1560¹Born
10 Mar 159939.1AppointedArchbishop of Aix, France
12 Mar 159939.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Aix, France
8 Sep 162464.6DiedArchbishop of Aix, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paul Hurault de l’Hospital (VIAF: 223441256)
Archbishop Paul Hurault de l’Hospital (born 1560, died ) Archbishop of Aix

EventPlace
Ordained BishopS. Pierre, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceParis, Diocese of Paris

  • a bishop for 25.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 89
  • b/23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1599, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018