Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles-Salomon du Serre

Deceased

Bishop of Gap, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1572¹Born
30 Aug 160028.6AppointedBishop of Gap, France
28 May 160129.4Ordained BishopBishop of Gap, France
16 May 163765.3DiedBishop of Gap, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Charles-Salomon du Serre
Bishop Charles-Salomon du Serre (born 1572, died ) Bishop of Gap

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChâteau d`Auriac, à la Rochette, Hautes Alpes

  • a bishop for 35.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 358
  • ob/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1601, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018