Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Guy Hurault de l’Hospital

Deceased

Archbishop of Aix


Events

DateEventTitle
2 Apr 1618AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Aix, France
2 Apr 1618AppointedTitular Archbishop of Augustopolis in Phrygia
1619¹Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Augustopolis in Phrygia
8 Sep 1624SucceededArchbishop of Aix, France
3 Dec 1625DiedArchbishop of Aix, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Guy Hurault de l’Hospital:
Archbishop Guy Hurault de l’Hospital (died ) Archbishop of Aix

  • a bishop for 6.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 89, and Page 101
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1618, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 17 Feb 2015