Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni de Clèves, C.R.S.A. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Bethleem


Events

DateEventTitle
2 May 1611AppointedTitular Bishop of Bethleem
22 Mar 1615Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bethleem
9 Oct 1619DiedTitular Bishop of Bethleem

MicroData Summary for Giovanni de Clèves:
Bishop Giovanni de Clèves C.R.S.A. (died ) Titular Bishop of Bethleem

  • a bishop for 4.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 114
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1615, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 10 Feb 2015