Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Auguste Duret, S.M.A. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Delta del Nilo

Titular Bishop of Bubastis

Superior General of Society of African Missions


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jan 1846BornBoussay, France
17 Dec 187025.0Ordained PriestPriest of Society of African Missions
10 Dec 188539.9AppointedPrefect of Delta del Nilo, Egypt
29 Nov 190963.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Delta del Nilo, Egypt
29 Nov 190963.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Bubastis
24 Feb 191064.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bubastis
Oct 1914³68.7AppointedSuperior General of Society of African Missions
10 Nov 191468.9ResignedVicar Apostolic of Delta del Nilo, Egypt
20 Aug 192074.6DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Delta del Nilo, Egypt

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Auguste Duret:
Bishop Auguste Duret S.M.A. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Delta del Nilo

  • a priest for 49.7 years
  • a bishop for 10.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: JPG
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 94
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1910, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013