Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Ephrem Bertreux, S.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Southern Solomon Islands, Solomon Islands

Titular Bishop of Musti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jan 1853Born
28 Aug 190350.6AppointedPrefect of Southern Solomon Islands, Solomon Islands
2 Jun 191259.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Musti
2 Jun 191259.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Southern Solomon Islands, Solomon Islands
28 Oct 191259.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Musti
4 Jan 191965.9DiedVicar Apostolic of Southern Solomon Islands, Solomon Islands

MicroData Summary for Jean-Ephrem Bertreux
Bishop Jean-Ephrem Bertreux S.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Southern Solomon Islands

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Jean-de-Boiseau, France

  • a bishop for 6.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1912, Number 72

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018