Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Egide Marie Roy, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Prefect of Kagoshima, Japan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Aug 1894Born
20 Jul 191924.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
23 Nov 192733.2AppointedPrefect of Kagoshima, Japan
11 May 192934.7AppointedPrefect of Kagoshima, Japan
193641.3DiedPrefect of Kagoshima, Japan

MicroData Summary for Egide Marie Roy
Father Egide Marie Roy O.F.M. (born , died 1936) Prefect of Kagoshima

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSt-Michel de Bellechasse, Canada

  • a priest for 16.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018