Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Carlo-Maria Cernelli

Deceased

Archbishop of Chieti, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1757¹Born
16 Mar 178225.2Ordained PriestPriest
10 Jan 182265.0SelectedArchbishop of Chieti, Italy
19 Apr 182265.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Chieti, Italy
21 Apr 182265.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Chieti, Italy
18 May 183780.3DiedArchbishop of Chieti, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Carlo-Maria Cernelli
Archbishop Carlo-Maria Cernelli (born 1757, died ) Archbishop of Chieti

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}

  • a priest for 55.1 years
  • a bishop for 15.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,837
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 364
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,822, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast