Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Fendale

Deceased

Bishop of Crotone (Cotrone)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Sep 1750BornIsca sul Ionio
23 Dec 178030.2Ordained PriestPriest
7 Apr 181867.5SelectedBishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy
25 May 181867.7ConfirmedBishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy
31 May 181867.7Ordained BishopBishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy
6 Mar 182877.4DiedBishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Fendale
Bishop Domenico Fendale (born , died ) Bishop of Crotone (Cotrone)

  • a priest for 47.2 years
  • a bishop for 9.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 165
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1818, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 10 May 2016