Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco-Saverio Domeniconi

Deceased

Bishop of Alatri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Dec 1761BornRoma
24 Sep 178523.7Ordained PriestPriest
25 May 181856.4AppointedBishop of Alatri, Italy
7 Jun 181856.4Ordained BishopBishop of Alatri, Italy
16 Feb 183573.1DiedBishop of Alatri, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco-Saverio Domeniconi
Bishop Francesco-Saverio Domeniconi (born , died ) Bishop of Alatri

  • a priest for 49.3 years
  • a bishop for 16.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1834
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 64
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1818, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 10 May 2016