Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Salvatore Maria Pignattaro, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Isernia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Apr 1745BornNapoli
27 Feb 176822.9Ordained PriestPriest
8 May 181873.1SelectedArchbishop of Santa Severina, Italy
25 May 181873.1ConfirmedArchbishop of Santa Severina, Italy
26 May 181873.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Santa Severina, Italy
20 Jun 182378.2SelectedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Isernia, Italy
24 Nov 182378.6ConfirmedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Isernia, Italy
24 Jan 182579.8ResignedBishop of Isernia, Italy
11 Feb 182680.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Isernia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Salvatore Maria Pignattaro:
Archbishop Salvatore Maria Pignattaro O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Isernia

  • a priest for 58.0 years
  • a bishop for 7.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1825
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 226, and Page 344

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013