Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Isaia Volpe (Volpi), O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop of Bobbio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Aug 1749BornGenova
21 Nov 176617.2ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
12 Jul 177222.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
25 May 181868.7AppointedBishop of Bobbio, Italy
31 May 181868.8Ordained BishopBishop of Bobbio, Italy
23 Sep 183081.1DiedBishop of Bobbio, Italy

MicroData Summary for Isaia Volpe (Volpi)
Bishop Isaia Volpe (Volpi) O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop of Bobbio

  • a priest for 58.1 years
  • a bishop for 12.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 113
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1818, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 10 May 2016