Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Chiarchiaro

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Lampsacus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Mar 1748Born
22 Nov 177224.7Ordained DeaconDeacon
25 Nov 177224.7Ordained PriestPriest
10 Jul 181668.3SelectedTitular Bishop of Lampsacus
23 Sep 181668.5ConfirmedTitular Bishop of Lampsacus
26 Sep 181668.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lampsacus
1834¹85.8DiedTitular Bishop of Lampsacus

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Chiarchiaro
Bishop Francesco Chiarchiaro (born , died 1834) Titular Bishop of Lampsacus

EventPlace
Birth PlacePalazzo Adriano

  • a priest for 61.1 years
  • a bishop for 17.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1816, Number 48
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 230

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018