Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe d’Amante

Deceased

Bishop of Ischia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jan 1752Born
22 May 181866.3SelectedBishop of Ischia, Italy
26 Jun 181866.4ConfirmedBishop of Ischia, Italy
28 Jun 181866.4Ordained BishopBishop of Ischia, Italy
17 Nov 184391.8DiedBishop of Ischia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe d’Amante
Bishop Giuseppe d’Amante (born , died ) Bishop of Ischia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceProcida

  • a bishop for 25.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 226
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1818, Number 58

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018