Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michele Ruopoli

Deceased

Bishop of Isernia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Feb 1758Born
16 Mar 178224.0Ordained PriestPriest
20 Mar 181860.0SelectedBishop of Isernia, Italy
25 May 181860.2ConfirmedBishop of Isernia, Italy
26 May 181860.2Ordained BishopBishop of Isernia, Italy
24 Dec 182163.8DiedBishop of Isernia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Michele Ruopoli
Bishop Michele Ruopoli (born , died ) Bishop of Isernia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNolan

  • a priest for 39.7 years
  • a bishop for 3.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 226
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1818, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast