Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Primo Principi

Deceased

Official Emeritus of the Roman Curia - Other

Titular Archbishop of Tyana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Sep 1894BornOsimo
23 Feb 191823.5Ordained PriestPriest
8 May 195661.7AppointedOfficial of the Roman Curia - Other
8 May 195661.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tyana
24 Jun 195661.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Tyana
24 Jun 196570.8RetiredOfficial of the Roman Curia - Other
3 Aug 197580.9DiedOfficial Emeritus of the Roman Curia - Other

MicroData Summary for Primo Principi:
Archbishop Primo Principi (born , died ) Official Emeritus of Roman Curia - Other

  • a priest for 57.4 years
  • a bishop for 19.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1956, Number 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013