Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Girolamo Cardinal Verospi

Deceased

Bishop of Osimo

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Agnese in Agone


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1599²BornRome
16 Dec 164142.9Elevated to Cardinal
10 Feb 164243.1AppointedBishop of Osimo, Italy
10 Feb 164243.1InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Agnese in Agone
27 Apr 164243.3Ordained BishopBishop of Osimo, Italy
5 Jan 165253.0DiedBishop of Osimo, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Verospi:
Girolamo Cardinal Verospi (born 1599, died ) Bishop of Osimo

  • a bishop for 9.6 years
  • a cardinal for 10.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 16 Dec 1641
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 107, Number 647
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 104
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1642, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015