Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo Brizio, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Alba (Pompea)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1597¹BornBra
10 Apr 162124.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
15 Dec 164245.9AppointedBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy
28 Dec 164245.9Ordained BishopBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy
2 Nov 166568.8DiedBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paolo Brizio:
Bishop Paolo Brizio O.F.M. (died ) Bishop of Alba (Pompea)

  • a priest for 44.5 years
  • a bishop for 22.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 75
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 108, Number 655
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1642, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 3 Apr 2015