Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Perotti

Deceased

Archbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa)


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Jun 1650AppointedArchbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
10 Jul 1650Ordained BishopArchbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
25 Sep 1664DiedArchbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Francesco Perotti
Archbishop Francesco Perotti (died ) Archbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa)

  • a bishop for 14.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 291
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1650, Number 33
  • ob/c2: AT, 20 Dec 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 20 Dec 2016