Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vitalis de L’Estang

Deceased

Bishop of Carcassonne, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Apr 1588Born
9 Feb 161526.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Carcassonne, France
9 Feb 161526.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Ephesus
24 Feb 161526.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ephesus
11 Aug 162133.3SucceededBishop of Carcassonne, France
28 Sep 165264.4DiedBishop of Carcassonne, France

MicroData Summary for Vitalis de L’Estang
Bishop Vitalis de L’Estang (born , died ) Bishop of Carcassonne

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMalzieu

  • a bishop for 37.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 134, and Page 183
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 57, Number 327
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1615, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018