Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pasquale Grassi

Deceased

Bishop of Chioggia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Apr 1584BornChioggia
29 Apr 161935.0AppointedBishop of Chioggia, Italy
2 Jun 161935.1Ordained BishopBishop of Chioggia, Italy
12 Dec 163652.6DiedBishop of Chioggia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pasquale Grassi
Bishop Pasquale Grassi (born , died ) Bishop of Chioggia

  • a bishop for 17.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 154
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 66, Number 383
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1619, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 16 Oct 2016