Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Matteo Sanudo

Deceased

Bishop of Concordia (Sagittaria)


Events

DateEventTitle
2 Dec 1615AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy
2 Dec 1615AppointedTitular Bishop of Ioppe
8 Dec 1615Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ioppe
1616²SucceededBishop of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy
22 Feb 1641DiedBishop of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Matteo Sanudo:
Bishop Matteo Sanudo (died ) Bishop of Concordia (Sagittaria)

  • a bishop for 25.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 159, and Page 210
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 59, Number 337

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013