Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Emo, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Crema


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1573¹BornVenezia
159219.0Ordained PriestPriest
4 Jul 161239.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Crema, Italy
4 Jul 161239.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Larissa in Syria
8 Jul 161239.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Larissa in Syria
6 Jun 161643.4SucceededBishop of Crema, Italy
28 Sep 162956.7DiedBishop of Crema, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Emo:
Bishop Pietro Emo C.R. (died ) Bishop of Crema

  • a priest for 37.7 years
  • a bishop for 17.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 167, and Page 216
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 52, Number 292

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013