Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mikołaj Gabriel Fredro, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Bacău


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1590¹BornPrzemyśl
19 Jul 162737.5AppointedBishop of Bacău, Romania
10 Aug 162737.6Ordained BishopBishop of Bacău, Romania
29 Apr 163242.3DiedBishop of Bacău, Romania

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Mikołaj Gabriel Fredro:
Bishop Mikołaj Gabriel Fredro O.F.M. (died ) Bishop of Bacău

  • a bishop for 4.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 107
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 89, Number 533
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1627, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 2 Mar 2015