Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ruggero Tritonio

Deceased

Bishop of Poreč (Parenzo), Croatia


Events

DateEventTitle
31 Jan 1633AppointedBishop of Poreč (Parenzo), Croatia
13 Feb 1633Ordained BishopBishop of Poreč (Parenzo), Croatia
23 Jun 1644DiedBishop of Poreč (Parenzo), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Ruggero Tritonio
Bishop Ruggero Tritonio (died ) Bishop of Poreč (Parenzo)

  • a bishop for 11.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 274
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 93, Number 557
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1633, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018