Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacomo Marenco

Deceased

Bishop of Nice


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1577¹BornMondovì
30 Aug 162750.6AppointedBishop of Saluzzo, Italy
8 Sep 162750.6Ordained BishopBishop of Saluzzo, Italy
12 Nov 162750.8InstalledBishop of Saluzzo, Italy
17 Dec 163457.9AppointedBishop of Nice, France
2 Jan 164467.0DiedBishop of Nice, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Marenco:
Bishop Giacomo Marenco (died ) Bishop of Nice

  • a bishop for 16.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 302, and Page 258
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 90, Number 534
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1627, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 2 Mar 2015