Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ottavio Branciforte

Deceased

Bishop of Catania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1599¹Born
10 Jan 163334.0AppointedBishop of Cefalý, Italy
16 Jan 163334.0Ordained BishopBishop of Cefalý, Italy
2 Mar 163839.1AppointedBishop of Catania, Italy
14 Jun 164647.4DiedBishop of Catania, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ottavio Branciforte (VIAF: 88772783)
Bishop Ottavio Branciforte (born 1599, died ) Bishop of Catania

  • a bishop for 13.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 146, and Page 142
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 93, Number 556
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1633, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 8 Sep 2016