Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Loreto Di Franco (De Franchis)

Deceased

Bishop of Minori


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1578¹BornCastello di Sangro
1604¹26.0Ordained PriestPriest
22 Mar 163456.2AppointedBishop of Capri, Italy
26 Mar 163456.2Ordained BishopBishop of Capri, Italy
1 Dec 163658.9AppointedBishop of Minori, Italy
1638²60.0DiedBishop of Minori, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Loreto Di Franco (De Franchis):
Bishop Loreto Di Franco (De Franchis) (born 1578, died 1638) Bishop of Minori

  • a priest for 34.0 years
  • a bishop for 3.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 133, and Page 244
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 93, Number 560
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1634, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015