Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Alessandro Cardinal Damasceni Peretti

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Albano

Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Damaso


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1571²Born
13 May 158514.3Elevated to Cardinal
14 Jun 158514.4InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Girolamo dei Croati
20 Apr 158716.3AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Cosmedin
11 Sep 158716.6AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eustachio
13 Mar 158918.1AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Lorenzo in Damaso
30 Mar 162049.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Damaso
6 Apr 162049.2AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
19 Jul 162049.5Ordained BishopBishop of Albano
2 Jun 162352.4DiedCardinal-Bishop of Albano

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Damasceni Peretti (VIAF: 62291064)
Alessandro Cardinal Damasceni Peretti (born 1571, died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Albano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontalto
Ordained BishopPapal Chapel, Quirinale Apostolic Palace, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlacePalace of the Chancery, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Santo Presepio Chapel, St. Peter's, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 2.8 years
  • a cardinal for 38.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 13 May 1585
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 69, Number 401
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1620, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 27 Feb 2017